FL H0833 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Chapter No. 2013-244
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Defines "negative notice"; requires assignee's bond to be in at least specific amount or double liquidation value of unencumbered & liquid assets of estate, whichever is higher; authorizes assignee to conduct certain discovery to determine whether to prosecute certain claims or causes of action; extends time period assignee may conduct business of assignor; authorizes assignee to continue conducting business of assignor by serving negative notice; extends time period for which court may authorize assignee to conduct business of assignor; provides procedures for assignee's rejection of unexpired lease of nonresidential real property or of personal property; requires assignee to serve notice of rejection on certain persons & file with court; requires that notice of rejection for personal property include certain information about affected property; specifies effective date of rejection; requires estate's rights & obligations to & liability for affected property to terminate; extends minimum time period for giving notice to assignor & creditors; provides procedure for serving notice on persons; requires objection to be filed & served within specific time period; requires notice to be in specified form; provides that assignee may take certain actions if objection is not filed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Assignments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#32 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#208 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-01 Chapter No. 2013-244
2013-06-28 Approved by Governor
2013-06-17 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2013-04-29HouseOrdered enrolled
2013-04-26SenateCS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
2013-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2013-04-25SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2013-04-25SenateRead 2nd time
2013-04-25SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1098
2013-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2013-04-25SenateWithdrawn from Judiciary; Banking and Insurance; Rules
2013-04-24SenateReceived
2013-04-24SenateReferred to Judiciary; Banking and Insurance; Rules
2013-04-24SenateIn Messages
2013-04-24HouseCS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
2013-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2013-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2013-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2013-04-19HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/13
2013-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2013-04-04HouseCS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2013-04-04HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2013-04-03HouseCS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2013-04-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/03/13, 8:30 am, 404 HOB
2013-03-28HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2013-03-28HouseFavorable by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2013-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/28/13, 8:00 am, 404 HOB
2013-03-18HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2013-03-18HouseNow in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
2013-03-15HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2013-03-13HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2013-03-11HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/13/13, 12:00 pm, 404 HOB
2013-03-05HouseIntroduced
2013-02-28HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2013-02-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1098 (Same As) 2013-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 833 (Ch. 2013-244)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
727103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
727104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
727108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
727109Amended CodeSee Bill Text
727110Amended CodeSee Bill Text
727111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
727113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
727117Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/833
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0833/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0833/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0833/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0833/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0833/Amendment/167595/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0833/Amendment/532737/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0833/FloorVotes/LY1fo5dbLfVvflcyNqDVOkvepWM%3D%7C14%2FPublic%2FVotes%2FBill%2F20130424%2FHouseVote%5Fh0833c2208%2EPDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0833/FloorVotes/yNDgm4pA9c0FtEBgtqtSvc2vEZs%3D%7C14%2FPublic%2FVotes%2FBill%2F20130426%2FSenateVote%5Fh0833c2032%2EPDF

Bill Comments

feedback