FL H0835 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes elector to attain status as permanent absentee voter; specifies circumstances under which request for absentee ballot may be considered canceled.
Title
Elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Policy Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00076; On Committee agenda-- Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), 02/17/10, 8:30 am, Webster Hall --Workshopped | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Policy Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; On Committee agenda-- Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), 02/17/10, 8:30 am, Webster Hall --Workshopped | |
2010-01-29 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1246 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections