FL H0845 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Board of Naturopathic Medicine to establish certain fees; provides for fees for licensure by examination & licensure by endorsement, respectively, of naturopathic physicians; provides for licensure renewal fees; authorizes board to set by rule certain fees related to inactive licenses & reactivation of licensure.
Title
Fees/Naturopathic Medicine
Sponsors
Rep. David Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2024-01-22 | House | Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-12-27 | House | Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-12-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H843 (Related) 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee
S900 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
S898 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
S900 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
S898 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
462 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |