FL H0843 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Board of Naturopathic Medicine within DOH; requires board, in conjunction with DOH, to establish disciplinary training program for board members; prohibits certain unlicensed persons from practicing naturopathic medicine or promoting, identifying, or describing themselves using specified titles or abbreviations; provides for licensure by examination & by endorsement, respectively, of naturopathic physicians; requires DOH & board to use DOH's investigative process to ensure that applicants meet applicable criteria; revises requirements for licensure renewal & continuing education requirements for naturopathic physicians; provides financial responsibility requirements as condition of licensure; establishes Naturopathic Medical Formulary Council; provides for membership of council; requires council to establish Naturopathic Medical Formulary.
Title
Naturopathic Medicine
Sponsors
Rep. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-24 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda |
2024-01-24 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2024-01-24 | House | Favorable by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2024-01-22 | House | Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-12-27 | House | Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-12-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H845 (Related) 2024-03-08 - Died in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
S898 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
S900 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
S898 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
S900 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
462 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 019 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 027 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
462 | 2001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |