FL H0863 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides requirements for operation of recreational vessels by persons younger than specified age; revises minimum age to operate personal watercraft; removes exemption from photographic identification & boating safety identification card requirement for person accompanied in vessel by another person who meets certain criteria.
Title
Boating Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-12-18 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2015-12-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0644 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
327 | 385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 395 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/863 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0863/BillText/Filed/PDF |