FL H0885 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for specified fees & fines to be deposited into clerks' fine & forfeiture fund instead of General Revenue; revises list of court-related functions that clerks of circuit court may fund from fees, charges, costs, & fines; provides annual transfer of specified funds to Clerks of Court Trust Fund rather than to General Revenue Fund; provides for state responsibility for jury-related costs; provides for reimbursement to clerks of court for jury-related costs; provides for apportionment of reimbursement for jury-related costs; specifies authorized budget for clerks of circuit court for 2015-2016 county fiscal year; authorizes Florida Clerks of Court Operations Corporation to determine budget amounts for individual clerks for that period.
Title
Clerks of the Court
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1080 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 083 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/885 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0885/BillText/Filed/PDF |