FL H1009 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DOH to develop & annually update educational materials relating to pediatric cardiopulmonary resuscitation; requires certain facilities to provide materials to parents of newborns; provides that attending health care providers at home births are responsible for providing materials to parents; revises list of telehealth services & education provided under telehealth minority maternity care pilot programs; requires birth centers to educate their clients in pediatric cardiopulmonary resuscitation.
Title
Pediatric Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-07 | House | Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-12-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1506 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
383 | 147 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 2163 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 1053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1009 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1009/BillText/Filed/PDF |