FL H1011 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises method for calculating amount of sales & use tax to be paid or collected.
Title
Sales and Use Tax/Method for Calculating Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Jake Raburn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | House | Referred to Finance and Tax Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0966 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1011 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1011/BillText/Filed/PDF |