FL H1071 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises honorary designation of transportation facility in specified county.
Title
Transportation Facility Designations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193) |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S576 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
H73 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
S368 (Similar To) 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-193
H73 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
S368 (Similar To) 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-193
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1071 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1071/BillText/Filed/PDF |