FL H1133 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definition of "recovered materials" to include certain wood, asphalt, and concrete materials.
Title
Recovered Materials
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Government Accountability Committee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-20 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | CS by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-15 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-14 | House | CS by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1 |
2017-03-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, 03/14/17, 2:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1288 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
171 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 709 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 7045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |