FL H1171 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain employers intending to relocate out of state or cease operation to notify DBPR; provides penalty; requires DBPR to compile list of employers that relocate or cease operation; provides that such employers are ineligible for certain benefits for specified period; requires such employers to remit certain funds to DBPR; requires each state agency head to ensure certain services are performed by state contractors within state; requires compliance by certain contractors by specified date.
Title
Workforce Retention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-07 | House | Referred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2018-01-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1754 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
559 | 952 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 9521 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 9522 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 9523 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 9524 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 9525 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1171 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1171/BillText/Filed/PDF |