FL H1201 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes DOC to contract with certain entities to provide education services for Correctional Education Program; authorizes each county to contract with certain entities to provide education services for county inmates; authorizes use of state funds for operation of postsecondary workforce programs for education of certain state inmates.
Title
Education for Prisoners
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#31 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#723 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#723 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Chapter No. 2018-104 | |
2018-03-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-21 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-03-09 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1318 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2018-03-01 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18 |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-15 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/15/18, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2018-02-08 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Favorable by Education Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/07/18, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2018-01-25 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/24/18, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-07 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Education Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1318 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 1201
H7089 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S1218 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H7089 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S1218 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1011 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
951 | 176 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |