FL H1203 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Economic Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Economic Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions for use of traffic infraction detectors to enforce specified provisions when a driver has failed to stop at a traffic signal; requires each jurisdiction to establish minimum yellow light-change interval times for each intersection designated to receive traffic infraction detector; requires that traffic infraction officer who issues traffic citation complete training course; provides that person charged with traffic infraction may request hearing within 180 days after date of violation under certain circumstances.
Title
Traffic Control
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Economic Affairs Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Economic Affairs Committee; Appropriations Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1061 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160)
S1342 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S1342 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 0083 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 640 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1203 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1203/BillText/Filed/PDF |