FL H1209 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Adopted; YEAS 98, NAYS 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Adopted; YEAS 98, NAYS 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Strongly encouraging all state executive agencies, all law enforcement agencies, & all local governments in this state to suspend contact & outreach activities with Council on American-Islamic Relations.
Title
Disassociation from Council on American-Islamic Relations
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Fine [R] | Rep. Kimberly Daniels [D] | Rep. Alina Garcia [R] | Rep. Jeff Holcomb [R] |
Rep. Tom Leek [R] | Rep. Jim Mooney [R] | Rep. Michelle Salzman [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#570 (Y: 98 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Adopted; YEAS 98, NAYS 15 |
2024-02-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-24 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/1/2024) |
2024-01-23 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-01-23 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2024-01-23 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2024-01-23 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee |
2024-01-19 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-04 | House | Filed |