FL H1243 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes district school board to set opening date for schools in district to accommodate completion of student classwork & assessments during fall term.
Title
Opening and Closing of Public Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee -HJ 214 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 123 | |
2012-01-05 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1243 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1243/BillText/Filed/PDF |