FL H1243 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires court to order defendant arrested for act of domestic violence not to possess firearms or ammunition as condition of bail; prohibits individual with outstanding warrant issued for act of domestic violence from possessing firearm or ammunition; authorizes court to issue arrest warrant for act of domestic violence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic Violence

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-17HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1540 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4936108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7412901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
790065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
90102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430583Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback