FL H1267 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes limitation on application of certain funds to provide additional intensive reading instruction; specifies method for designating the 300 lowest-performing elementary schools; requires categorical funds for supplemental academic instruction to be provided in FEFP; provides for determining allocation of categorical funding, recalculation of categorical funding, & prorating allocation.
Title
Supplemental Academic Instruction
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Diamond [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116) |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-10 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1492 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
H5101 (Similar To) 2017-04-13 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
S2516 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116), CS/CS/SB 890 (Ch. 2017-75), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
H7069 (Similar To) 2017-06-16 - Chapter No. 2017-116, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 15 (Ch. 2017-166), CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2017-55), CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2017-177), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
H5101 (Similar To) 2017-04-13 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
S2516 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116), CS/CS/SB 890 (Ch. 2017-75), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
H7069 (Similar To) 2017-06-16 - Chapter No. 2017-116, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 15 (Ch. 2017-166), CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2017-55), CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2017-177), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1267 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1267/BillText/Filed/PDF |