FL H1361 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises name program & creates an additional program within DJJ; repeals provisions relating to shared county & state responsibility for juvenile detention; removes obsolete language concerning sharing of costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Justice

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied on Calendar
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-18HouseFavorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-02-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2020-02-11HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2020-02-11HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2020-02-07HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/11/20, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2020-01-29HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-01-28HouseFavorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2020-01-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2020-01-17HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1144 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S700 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
H5003 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-114

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20316Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985686Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9856865Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback