FL H1493 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits construction, operation, or expansion of wind energy facilities & offshore wind energy facilities in state; authorizes injunctive relief; requires DEP to adopt rules.
Title
Wind Energy Facility Siting
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1718 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulated Industries
H1645 (Similar To) 2024-04-30 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
S1624 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1645
H1645 (Similar To) 2024-04-30 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
S1624 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1645
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1493 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1493/BillText/Filed/PDF |