FL H2729 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 3034)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 3034)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Aerial Photography.
Title
Aerial Photography
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 3034) | |
2017-05-08 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 3034) |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-14 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/14/17, 10:00 am, Morris Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/2729 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/2729/BillText/Filed/PDF |