FL H5501 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to Auditor General, Revenue Estimating Conference, state university & Florida College System institution funding & budgets, direct-support organizations, transfer of certain state funds, Florida & Bright Futures Program.
Title
Higher Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-03 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/03/19 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/27/19, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H839 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 741 (Ch. 2019-59), CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
H7051 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103)
S190 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Chapter No. 2019-103, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
S1296 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
S1744 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103)
H5001 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), HB 5301 (Ch. 2019-118), HB 5303 (Ch. 2019-161), HB 5401 (Ch. 2019-141), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116), SB 2504 (Ch. 2019-117), SB 7016 (Ch. 2019-8)
S2500 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Chapter No. 2019-115, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), HB 5301 (Ch. 2019-118), HB 5303 (Ch. 2019-161), HB 5401 (Ch. 2019-141), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116), SB 2504 (Ch. 2019-117), SB 7016 (Ch. 2019-8)
H7051 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103)
S190 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Chapter No. 2019-103, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
S1296 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
S1744 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103)
H5001 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), HB 5301 (Ch. 2019-118), HB 5303 (Ch. 2019-161), HB 5401 (Ch. 2019-141), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116), SB 2504 (Ch. 2019-117), SB 7016 (Ch. 2019-8)
S2500 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Chapter No. 2019-115, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), HB 5301 (Ch. 2019-118), HB 5303 (Ch. 2019-161), HB 5401 (Ch. 2019-141), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116), SB 2504 (Ch. 2019-117), SB 7016 (Ch. 2019-8)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 70 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 84 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 841 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
216 | 136 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5501 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5501/BillText/Filed/PDF |