FL H6023 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deletes provision that prohibits person from receiving homestead exemption in this state if person is receiving ad valorem tax exemption or tax credit in another state that requires permanent residency for eligibility.
Title
Ad Valorem Taxation
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Fine [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1318 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/6023 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/6023/BillText/Filed/PDF |