FL H6503 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for relief of Rafael Rodriguez by Hendry County Hospital Authority; provides appropriation to compensate Rafael Rodriguez for injuries sustained from Hendry County Hospital Authority employee negligence; provides limitation on attorney fees.
Title
Relief/Rafael Rodriguez/Hendry County Hospital Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-09-25 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-09-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S10 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6503 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6503/BillText/Filed/PDF |