FL H7021 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1718
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1718
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Division of Food, Nutrition, & Wellness; renames & revises jurisdiction of DOACS's Office of Energy & Water; creates Agricultural Fee, Seed, & Fertilizer Advisory Council; repeals provisions for John A. Mulrennan, Sr., Arthropod Research Laboratory & Florida Agricultural Exposition; repeals provisions for various councils, including Plant Industry Technical Council, Fertilizer Technical Council, Seed Technical Council, Commercial Feed Technical Council, & Aquaculture Interagency Coordinating Council; revises requirements for compensation & reimbursement for per diem & travel expenses of members of various boards, including advisory bodies, Sturgeon Production Working Group, Private Investigation, Recovery, & Security Advisory Council, Citrus Research & Development Foundation's board of directors, Soil & Water Conservation Council, Florida Forestry Council, & Florida State Fair Authority; requires DOACS to perform certain staff duties & functions related to conservation easements; authorizes DOACS to adopt federal model Food Code; revises expiration dates of certain provisions regulating fertilizers; revises various provisions related to mosquito control districts & Florida Coordinating Council, testing of milk or milk products, agricultural commodity marketing order assessments, reporting requirements for commercial feed or feedstuff, transportation & sale of water hyacinths, membership & appointment of Soil & Water Conservation Council, jurisdiction & dissolution of soil & water conservation districts, jurisdiction to enforce burning regulations, & waiver of aquaculture registration fees for certain schools; repeals provisions for inspection & vaccination of cattle for brucellosis; & renames "Wounded Warrior Special Hunt Areas" of state forests.
Title
Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#744 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#744 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1718 | |
2012-03-09 | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 1148 | |
2012-03-09 | Withdrawn from Agriculture; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget -SJ 1147 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Agriculture; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget -SJ 834 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 834 | |
2012-02-16 | In Messages | |
2012-02-15 | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 614 | |
2012-02-15 | Read 3rd time -HJ 613 | |
2012-02-14 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-14 | Read 2nd time -HJ 593 | |
2012-02-10 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/12 | |
2012-01-27 | CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time -HJ 295 | |
2012-01-27 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 297 | |
2012-01-26 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-25 | CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 300 | |
2012-01-23 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 01/25/12, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall | |
2012-01-20 | Now in State Affairs Committee -HJ 247 | |
2012-01-19 | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 234 | |
2012-01-19 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-18 | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 239 | |
2012-01-13 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/18/12, 9:30 am, Reed Hall | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 158 | |
2011-12-29 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 159 | |
2011-12-13 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
253 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 2523 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 2524 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
388 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
388 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
388 | 323 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
388 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
388 | 46 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 147 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
502 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
502 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 0705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 451 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
573 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
573 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
576 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
576 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
576 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
578 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
580 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
580 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
580 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
581 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
581 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
585 | 155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 277 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
590 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
597 | 0021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
597 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
597 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
597 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
597 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
604 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 252 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |