FL H7031 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Corrects cross-references to repealed section of Florida Statutes under Open Government Sunset Review Act.
Title
Open Government Sunset Review Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#330 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-28 | In Messages | |
2011-04-28 | Read 2nd time -HJ 844 | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/11 | |
2011-03-17 | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 260 | |
2011-03-15 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/17/11, 8:00 am, Morris Hall | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to State Affairs Committee -HJ 223 | |
2011-03-10 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
378 | 406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 0077 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 0321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |