FL H7041 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to study of effects of aging on driving ability, plan of DHSMV & FDLE to ensure identification of certain driver license records, & effect of classified licensure on persons holding chauffeur's license.
Title
Driver's Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - House - House Roll Call No. 0556 - Passage (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102) | |
2010-03-16 | In Messages | |
2010-03-10 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00247; Passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 -HJ 00247 | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00231 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Calendar -HJ 00150 | |
2010-03-01 | Referred to Calendar | |
2010-02-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1412 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-102; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 851 (Ch. 2010-221), CS/CS/CS/HB 1271 (Ch. 2010-225), HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70), HB 7131 (Ch. 2010-117), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138), HB 7243 (Ch. 2010-143), CS/SB 2386 (Ch. 2010-151)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0322 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0322 | 251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0322 | 58 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |