FL H7041 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/SB 90, 1st Eng.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/SB 90, 1st Eng.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises & provides provisions relating to voter registration applications, voter registration, elections and terms of county commissioners, ballots, voting systems, duplicate copies of ballots, audits, reports, vote-by-mail ballots, canvassing board duties, certain notifications, voter signatures, secure drop boxes, and penalties.
Title
Elections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/SB 90, 1st Eng. |
2021-04-26 | House | Amendment 762167 filed |
2021-04-23 | House | Amendment 440107 filed |
2021-04-22 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-22 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-04-20 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-20 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-18 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2021-04-14 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-12 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-04-12 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-12 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported out of Appropriations Committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda |
2021-03-24 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H635 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
S90 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Chapter No. 2021-11
S656 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 90 (Ch. 2021-11), CS/CS/SB 1890 (Ch. 2021-16)
S774 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 90 (Ch. 2021-11)
S90 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Chapter No. 2021-11
S656 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 90 (Ch. 2021-11), CS/CS/SB 1890 (Ch. 2021-16)
S774 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 90 (Ch. 2021-11)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
100 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
100 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 545 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 5605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 5614 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 572 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 591 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 595 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 68 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 69 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
104 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
104 | 0616 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
124 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 029 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 0575 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 1031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 0981 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
99 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |