FL H7053 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Ratifies & revises specified rules relating to environmental resource permitting.
Title
Ratification of the Department of Environmental Protection's Rules Relating to Stormwater
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - House - House Infrastructure Strategies Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Laid on Table |
2024-02-19 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-19 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-19 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-16 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-16 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2024-02-15 | House | Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2024-02-13 | House | Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda |
2024-01-31 | House | Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7040 (Same As) 2024-03-05 - Ordered enrolled