FL H7063 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 754 (Ch. 2014-181)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 754 (Ch. 2014-181)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DHSMV to stamp certain information on certificates of title for rebuilt vehicle or mobile home; defines "late model vehicle"; revises requirements for DHSMV to declare certain mobile homes & motor vehicles unrebuildable & to issue certificate of destruction; requires department to issue certificates of destruction for motor vehicles that are worth less than specified amount & are above certain age; requires department to provide report to Governor & Legislature regarding certificates of title for rebuilt motor vehicles.
Title
Certificates of Title
Sponsors
House Economic Affairs Committee | House Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee | House Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee | Rep. Lake Ray [R] |
Sen. Dana Young [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 754 (Ch. 2014-181) |
2014-04-25 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 754 |
2014-04-23 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/14 |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-07 | House | CS/CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2014-04-07 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-04-04 | House | CS/CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 3 |
2014-04-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/04/14, 9:30 am, Reed Hall |
2014-03-27 | House | Now in Economic Affairs Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | CS by Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-25 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-24 | House | CS by Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1 |
2014-03-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/24/14, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0754 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-181
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
319 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
319 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |