FL H7067 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Substituted SB 1016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Re-creates Indigent Civil Defense Trust Fund within Justice Administrative Commission without modification; abrogates provisions relating to termination of trust fund, to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Indigent Civil Defense Trust Fund/JAC

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-06 Substituted SB 1016
2011-04-01 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/06/11
2011-03-24 Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 -HJ 325
2011-03-22 On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/24/11, 11:30 am, Webster Hall
2011-03-14 Referred to Appropriations Committee -HJ 223
2011-03-10 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
275111Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback