FL H7067 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes court to base an order of pretrial detention solely on hearsay.
Title
Pretrial Detention Hearings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#967 (Y: 81 N: 31 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#44 (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#609 (Y: 84 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#44 (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#609 (Y: 84 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-07 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 81, NAYS 31 |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment 137798 Concur |
2024-03-07 | House | Added to Senate Message List |
2024-03-06 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Passed as amended; YEAS 33 NAYS 5 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (137798) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Substituted for SB 7068 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-02-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-02-15 | House | Passed; YEAS 84, NAYS 35 |
2024-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-15 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-02-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/15/2024) |
2024-02-09 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-09 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-08 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7068 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7067