FL S7068 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7067
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7067
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a court to base certain orders of pretrial detention solely on hearsay, etc.
Title
Pretrial Detention Hearings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 7067 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Substituted HB 7067 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/24 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 1 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 1 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/20/24, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
Same As/Similar To
H7067 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor