FL S0016 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Charles Pandrea by the North Broward Hospital District; providing for an appropriation to compensate Charles Pandrea, husband of Janet Pandrea, for the death of Janet Pandrea as a result of the negligence of the North Broward Hospital District, etc.
Title
Relief of Charles Pandrea by the North Broward Hospital District
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Steube [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/04/17, 9:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Unfavorable by Special Master on Claim Bills |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6527 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary Committee