FL S0030 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of the Estate of Dr. Sherrill Lynn Aversa; providing an appropriation to compensate the Estate of Dr. Sherrill Lynn Aversa for Dr. Aversa's death as a result of the negligence of the Department of Transportation; requiring the Executive Office of the Governor to establish spending authority from unappropriated trust fund balances of the department for compensation to the Estate of Dr. Sherrill Lynn Aversa; providing for attorney's fees and costs; providing a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc. CLAIM WITH APPROPRIATION:
Title
Relief of the Estate of Dr. Sherrill Lynn Aversa/Department of Transportation
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Special Master on Claim Bills | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 14 | |
2011-09-08 | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills -SJ 14 | |
2011-07-28 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/30 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0030/BillText/Filed/HTML |