FL S0032 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of former employees of Fairfax Street Wood Treaters; directing the Department of Health to collaborate with the National Institute for Occupational Safety and Health to develop specified data for certain purposes; providing an appropriation to compensate the former employees for injuries and damages sustained as a result of the negligence of the Department of Environmental Protection, the Department of Financial Services, and the Department of Health, etc.
Title
Relief of former employees of Fairfax Street Wood Treaters by the State of Florida
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Now in Health Policy |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 02/03/20, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Health Policy; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2019-08-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6509 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/32 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/32/BillText/Filed/HTML |