FL S0066 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Chapter No. 2024-67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Chapter No. 2024-67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as "Victoria's Law"; designating June 6 of each year as "Revive Awareness Day"; authorizing the Governor to issue an annual proclamation; encouraging the Department of Health to hold events to raise awareness of the dangers of opioid overdose and the availability and safe use of opioid antagonists as an effective way to rapidly reverse the effects of opioid overdose, etc.
Title
Revive Awareness Day
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee | Sen. Jason Brodeur [R] | Sen. Ed Hooper [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#878 (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-05 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-05 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Chapter No. 2024-67 | |
2024-04-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-03-27 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-06 | House | CS passed; YEAS 110, NAYS 1 |
2024-03-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-05 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-04 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-03-04 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024) |
2024-03-04 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-01 | House | In Messages |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2024-02-01 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/01/24 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/24/24, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2024-01-10 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/09/24, 4:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2023-12-05 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2023-12-05 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2023-11-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 12/05/23, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2023-10-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H89 (Same As) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table