FL S0132 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the Sunshine Scholarship Program; requiring the Department of Education to administer the program; requiring certain financial aid to be credited to a student's tuition and fees before the award of a Sunshine Scholarship; requiring a student to repay the scholarship amount under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sunshine Scholarship Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-21SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2020-01-21SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-01-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 01/21/20, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-09-03SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-08-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H55 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
S1004 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1009895Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback