FL S0158 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-38
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-38
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that an existing exemption from civil liability for farmers who gratuitously allow a person to enter upon their land for the purpose of removing farm produce or crops left in the field applies at any time, rather than only after harvesting; revising exceptions to the exemption, etc.
Title
Civil Liability of Farmers
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Evers [R] | Sen. Jack Latvala [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#238 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | Chapter No. 2015-38 | |
2015-05-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-05-07 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Amendment(s) failed (666257) |
2015-04-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-21 | House | Substituted for HB 137 |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15 |
2015-04-17 | House | Received |
2015-04-17 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2015-04-01 | House | In Messages |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/18/15 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Favorable by- Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/03/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 02/16/15, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Judiciary |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0137 (Similar To) 2015-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 158 (Ch. 2015-38)