FL S0180 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Chapter No. 2019-6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Chapter No. 2019-6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that certain provisions relating to lost or abandoned property do not apply to personal property lost or abandoned on the premises of certain complexes or facilities if certain conditions are met; providing for the disposal or donation of personal property lost or abandoned on the premises of certain complexes or facilities, in certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Lost or Abandoned Personal Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#35 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Chapter No. 2019-6 | |
2019-04-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-04-04 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2019-03-27 | House | Passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-27 | House | Substituted for HB 423 |
2019-03-21 | House | Received |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/27/19 |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | In Messages |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/19 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/20/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 3 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/11/19, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H423 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 180 (Ch. 2019-6)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
705 | 185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |