FL S0224 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Chapter No. 2024-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Chapter No. 2024-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing specified regional citizen volunteer advisory committees to conduct public meetings and workshops by means of communications media technology; requiring that such technology allow all persons to audibly communicate; providing notice requirements for public meetings or workshops conducted by means of communications media technology, etc.
Title
Citizen Volunteer Advisory Committees
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee | Sen. Tommy Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#902 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Chapter No. 2024-17 | |
2024-03-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-03-19 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-06 | House | CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0 |
2024-03-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-05 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-04 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-03-04 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024) |
2024-03-04 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-14 | House | In Messages |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2024-02-14 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/24 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/30/24, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-24 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-01-22 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/09/24, 4:30 pm, 401 Senate Building |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2023-10-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H413 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table