FL S0236 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Fiscal Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Fiscal Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the criteria for exempting a rural hospital or the not-for-profit operator of rural hospitals from the requirement to obtain a certificate of need for the construction of a new or replacement facility within the primary service area, etc.
Title
Certificates of Need for Rural Hospitals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Fiscal Policy |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/24/16, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/09/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Filed |