FL S0254 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring specified teachers to have received, at a minimum, a bachelor's degree; requiring private schools to provide specified students with a certain amount of time for recess; requiring private school students to participate in the statewide assessment program; requiring private schools to comply with the State Requirements for Educational Facilities of the Florida Building Code, etc.
Title
Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Education |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2020-12-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H641 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 271 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/254 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/254/BillText/Filed/HTML |