FL S0260 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 489 (Ch. 2015-115)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 489 (Ch. 2015-115)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the clerk of the value adjustment board to have available and distribute specified forms; authorizing the owner of multiple tangible personal property accounts to file a single joint petition with the value adjustment board under certain circumstances; providing that only a single filing fee may be charged for specified petitions to the value adjustment board with respect to real property or tangible personal property accounts, etc.
Title
Value Adjustment Board Proceedings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 489 (Ch. 2015-115) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 489 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/02/15 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/15 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 03/26/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2015-03-17 | Senate | CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-16 | Senate | CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/16/15, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/02/15, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled |
2015-02-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/16/15, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/03/15, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Fiscal Policy |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0489 (Similar To) 2015-06-11 - Chapter No. 2015-115
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
192 | 0105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
196 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |