FL S0272 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a person from using or applying cadmium in excess of a specified amount on any item of children's jewelry, toy, or child care article sold in this state. Provides an exception. Provides for a criminal penalty.
Title
Cadmium in Children's Products
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 30 | |
2011-01-05 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Health Regulation; Judiciary; Budget -SJ 30 | |
2010-12-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0111 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/272 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0272/BillText/Filed/HTML |