FL S0358 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-14 - Chapter No. 2014-9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-14 - Chapter No. 2014-9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the term "athletic coach"; expanding provisions relating to athletic coaches for independent sanctioning authorities to require such authorities to conduct specified background screening of certain coaches of youth athletic teams; providing that the duty may not be delegated; providing for disqualification; providing for exemption from disqualification; requiring that specified documentation be maintained for a specified period by such authorities, etc.
Title
Athletic Coaches for Youth Athletic Teams
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#848 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-14 | Chapter No. 2014-9 | |
2014-05-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-05-08 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-30 | House | CS passed; YEAS 119 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-29 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-29 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 139 |
2014-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-28 | House | Received |
2014-04-28 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/14 |
2014-04-28 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2014-04-23 | House | In Messages |
2014-04-11 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (455062) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Was taken up |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar, 04/03/14 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-25 | Senate | CS by Rules read 1st time |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/26/14 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | CS by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/20/14, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/12/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/05/14, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/04/14, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Community Affairs; Rules |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0139 (Similar To) 2014-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 358 (Ch. 2014-9)