FL S0376 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 309 -SJ 873
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 309 -SJ 873
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing titles for persons who hold a certificate as a specialty technologist; authorizing a person holding a certificate as a specialty technologist to perform the specific duties allowed for a specialty technologist as defined by the Department of Health; authorizing the Department of Health to adopt rules for recognizing certain national organizations that certify, license, or register specialty technologists; providing for an applicant for certification as a specialty technologist to be certified only by endorsement rather than by examination, etc.
Title
Radiological Personnel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 309 -SJ 873 | |
2012-03-06 | Read 3rd time -SJ 873 | |
2012-03-05 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-05 | Read 2nd time -SJ 786 | |
2012-03-02 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/12 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/12 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 671 | |
2012-02-21 | Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 -SJ 671 | |
2012-02-16 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 02/21/12, 3:45 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-02-01 | Now in Budget -SJ 314 | |
2012-02-01 | Favorable by Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 314 | |
2012-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations, 02/01/12, 10:15 am, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-26 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations, 01/31/12, 8:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled | |
2012-01-19 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations | |
2012-01-19 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 255 | |
2012-01-18 | Now in Budget -SJ 135 | |
2012-01-13 | CS by Health Regulation read 1st time -SJ 161 | |
2012-01-12 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-01-12 | CS by Health Regulation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 135 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 35 | |
2012-01-03 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 01/12/12, 10:15 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-10-18 | Referred to Health Regulation; Budget -SJ 35 | |
2011-09-29 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
468 | 3003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 3065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |