FL S0472 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7064 (Ch. 2023-86)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7064 (Ch. 2023-86)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing criminal penalties for the failure to verify and maintain specified documentation of an adult theater employee or contractor; requiring a mandatory minimum term of incarceration for a person convicted of solicitation of prostitution, lewdness, or assignation; requiring a commercial entity that publishes or distributes material harmful to minors on the Internet from a website that contains a substantial portion of such material to perform reasonable age verification, etc.
Title
Protection of Exploited Persons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7064 (Ch. 2023-86) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7045 (Similar To) 2023-05-02 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7064 (Ch. 2023-86)
S7064 (Similar To) 2023-05-17 - Chapter No. 2023-86
S7064 (Similar To) 2023-05-17 - Chapter No. 2023-86
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
450 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
847 | 126 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0433 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/472 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/472/BillText/Filed/HTML |