FL S0480 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Read 2nd time -SJ 729
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Removes a provision that requires the State Board of Administration to invest and reinvest moneys in the endowment fund for the Florida Endowment for Vocational Rehabilitation. Requires that a specified percent of the remainder of all civil penalties received by a county court and after distribution pursuant to ch. 318, F.S., be remitted to the Department of Revenue on a monthly basis, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Endowment for Vocational Rehabilitation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-03 Read 2nd time -SJ 729
2011-04-29 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/11
2011-04-27 Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 540
2011-04-13 Favorable by Budget Subcommittee on Higher Education Appropriations; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 468
2011-04-08 Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Higher Education Appropriations -SJ 473
2011-03-24 Now in Budget -SJ 286
2011-03-23 Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -SJ 286
2011-03-18 On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/23/11, 3:15 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2011-03-10 Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 185
2011-03-09 Favorable by Higher Education; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 185
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 43
2011-03-04 On Committee agenda-- Higher Education, 03/09/11, 3:15 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2011-02-25 Now in Higher Education -SJ 118
2011-02-22 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2011-02-21 CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 118
2011-02-10 On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/21/11, 1:45 pm, 412 Knott Building
2011-01-25 Referred to Community Affairs; Higher Education; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 43
2011-01-19 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0811 () 2011-05-03 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1102

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
413615Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback