FL S0480 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring students to earn one-half credit in health education, independent of the physical education credit requirements, for high school graduation; authorizing a waiver for students who request to take and successfully complete a health education assessment developed by the Department of Education, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High School Graduation Requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11SenateDied in Education Pre-K - 12
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced
2015-10-21SenateReferred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2015-10-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0125 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10034282Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback