FL H0125 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires students to earn one-half credit in health education for high school graduation; authorizes waiver for students who request to take & successfully complete health education assessment; reduces number of required credits in elective courses.
Title
High School Graduation Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in K-12 Subcommittee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-09-24 | House | Referred to K-12 Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2015-09-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0480 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/125 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0125/BillText/Filed/PDF |